FL H2295 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 372)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 372)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Technology Enhancements for Adults with Severe and Persistent Mental Health Disorders.
Title
Technology Enhancements for Adults with Severe and Persistent Mental Health Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 372) | |
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 372) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-21 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Filed |