FL H2251 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1200)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1200)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Integrated Care and Coordination for Youth (ICCY).
Title
Integrated Care and Coordination for Youth (ICCY)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1200) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-06 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-10-16 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2251 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/2251/BillText/Filed/PDF |