FL H2251 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Children's Community Action Team - Halifax Health-Volusia/Flagler.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Community Action Team - Halifax Health-Volusia/Flagler

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-06HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback