FL H2021 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 240)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 240)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Project GROW (Giving Real Opportunities for Work)-Kathleen Anderson Comprehensive Work Center.
Title
Project GROW (Giving Real Opportunities for Work)-Kathleen Anderson Comprehensive Work Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 240) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 1:15 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2021 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/2021/BillText/Filed/PDF |