FL H1621 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Early Learning Scholarship Program; establishes eligibility criteria; requires program funds be used for specified purpose; provides for program administration; requires report; specifies provider eligibility criteria; exempts state from liability.
Title
Early Learning Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-02 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-02 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | PCS added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1496 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education