FL H1567 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1944, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires PSC to regulate & enforce rates, charges, terms, & conditions for pole attachments; specifies PSC powers related to pole attachments; requires PSC to apply certain decisions & orders of FCC; provides guidance for use by PSC in making certain determinations; specifies party rights regarding pole attachments; requires PSC to provide certification to FCC upon adoption of certain rules; requires PSC to regulate safety, vegetation management, repair, replacement, maintenance, relocation, emergency response, & storm restoration of certain communications services providers; requires PSC to create process requiring advance hardening project notice; provides requirements for pole attachments & liabilities; requires PSC to adopt rules, including monetary penalties, by specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility and Communication Service Poles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1944, 1st Eng.
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-21House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-21HouseCS Filed
2021-04-21HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-21HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-07HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-07HouseReported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-07HouseFavorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-05HouseAdded to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-22HouseNow in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-22HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseOriginal reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-18House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-18HouseCS Filed
2021-03-18HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-18HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-12HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1944 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Message sent to senate

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36697Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Amendment/206049/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567b.SAT.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567c.SAT.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1567/Analyses/h1567z.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58487&IsPCB=0&BillId=72809
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60135&IsPCB=0&BillId=72809
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60579&IsPCB=0&BillId=72809

Bill Comments 750

feedback