FL H1517 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Raymond L. Marky Speedy Trial Reform Act"; provides legislative findings & intent concerning speedy trial requirements; specifies periods for commencement of trial absent request for application of speedy trial time periods; specifies periods for commencement of trial when request for application of speedy trial periods is made; provides grounds for denial of such motion, etc.
Title
Criminal Trials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0941 - Passage (Y: 70 N: 41 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0940 - Quorum (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0940 - Quorum (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01047; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01048; CS passed as amended; YEAS 70 NAYS 41 -HJ 01048 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00903; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00903 | |
2010-04-02 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00489 | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable by- Rules and Calendar Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 5 -HJ 00489 | |
2010-03-30 | On Council agenda-- Rules and Calendar Council, 04/01/10, 5:00 pm or 15 minutes upon adjournment of Session, 404-H | |
2010-03-28 | CS referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00416; Now in Rules and Calendar Council | |
2010-03-25 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-26 | CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00405 | |
2010-03-22 | CS by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 3 -HJ 00407 | |
2010-03-18 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 03/22/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00257 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00138 | |
2010-03-01 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0918 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |