FL H1487 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to expiration & renewal of declarations of public health emergency; authorizes individual to refuse examination, testing, or treatment under State Health Officer's order during public health emergency by submitting written refusal to State Health Officer; provides that such individuals may not be required to undergo such examination, testing, or treatment; removes State Health Officer's authority to use any means necessary to treat individual under certain circumstances.
Title
Declarations of a Public Health Emergency
Sponsors
House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | Rep. Joel Rudman [R] | Rep. Adam Anderson [R] | Rep. Doug Bankson [R] |
Rep. Tyler Sirois [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Original reference removed: Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-04-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-04 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | House | PCS added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1618 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Policy