FL H1485 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Monica Cantillo Acosta & Luis Alberto Cantillo Acosta, surviving children of Nhora Acosta, by Miami-Dade County; provides for appropriation to compensate them for wrongful death of their mother, Nhora Acosta, due to injuries sustained as result of negligence of Miami-Dade County bus driver; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs. CLAIM:
Title
Relief/Monica Cantillo Acosta and Luis Alberto Cantilla Acosta/Miami-Dade County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1146 (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1086 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1086 (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in returning Messages | |
2012-03-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 7 -HJ 1183 | |
2012-03-08 | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (529297) -HJ 1183 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 3 -SJ 955 | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 955 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Rules -SJ 831 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 7 -HJ 1093 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1093 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1057 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 835 | |
2012-02-24 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 835 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/24/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-20 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 680 | |
2012-02-20 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-17 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 -HJ 686 | |
2012-02-15 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/17/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced -HJ 210 | |
2012-01-12 | Filed |