FL H1475 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to factors to be considered for alimony awards; revises provisions relating to awards of durational alimony; revises provisions relating to awards of permanent alimony; provides that award of alimony may not leave payor with significantly less net income than net income of recipient unless there are written findings of exceptional circumstances; provides for applicability.
Title
Alimony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#367 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-28 | In Messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 886 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 645 | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-04-06 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 450 | |
2011-04-05 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-01 | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 415 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/01/11, 8:45 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 273 | |
2011-03-18 | Filed |