FL H1471 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1965
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1965
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 3, Art. I of State Constitution to provide that, consistent with U.S. Constitution, no individual or entity may be denied, on basis of religious identity or belief, governmental benefits, funding, or other support, & to delete prohibition against using revenues from public treasury directly or indirectly in aid of any church, sect, or religious denomination or in aid of any sectarian institution.
Title
Religious Freedom
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#309 (Y: 81 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1965 | |
2011-05-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 1021 | |
2011-05-05 | Received -SJ 1019 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 3rd time -HJ 812 | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time -HJ 789 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/11 | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 671 | |
2011-04-15 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-14 | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 4 -HJ 660 | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4 -HJ 368 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/29/11, 12:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 273 | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |