FL H1457 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-16 - Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Pending: House Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes prohibition on awarding annual contracts by district school boards on basis of unauthorized contingencies or conditions; requires that annual contract of instructional personnel who meet certain criteria be renewed; provides responsibilities for district school superintendents who exercise certain authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts for Instructional Personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-16HouseNow in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1592 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
H6107 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
S1602 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012335Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback