FL H1435 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provision that prohibits adult children & parents of adult children from recovering certain damages in medical negligence suits.
Title
Damages Recoverable in Wrongful Death Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S690 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1435 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1435/BillText/Filed/PDF |