FL H1421 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Constitution to expand CFO's duties to require that he or she participate as a principal in consensus economic, demographic, & revenue estimating conferences & review & certify certain state contracts above threshold dollar amount to ensure compliance with certain laws and that such contracts do not require payments in any fiscal year which exceed amount appropriated or amount authorized by law; requires Legislature to enact legislation to implement amendment.
Title
Duties of the Chief Financial Officer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-27 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/27/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2018-02-13 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-08 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 02/08/18, 5:15 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S792 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages