FL H1421 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Chapter No. 2013-269
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Chapter No. 2013-269
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for special alcoholic beverage license to be issued to certain hotels & motels.
Title
Madison County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#306 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#306 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Chapter No. 2013-269 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/01/13 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2013-04-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-29 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/13 |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-16 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Introduced |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed |