FL H1411 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-150
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the requirements for disposal of fetal remains; revising the criminal punishment for failure to properly dispose of fetal remains; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to develop and enforce rules relating to license inspections and investigations of certain clinics; requiring certain organizations that provide abortion referral services or abortion counseling services to register with the agency, pay a specified fee, and include certain
Title
Termination of Pregnancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#825 (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#707 (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#684 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#707 (Y: 74 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#684 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Chapter No. 2016-150 | |
2016-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-09 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2016-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 76 NAYS 40 |
2016-03-09 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (829246) |
2016-03-09 | House | Was taken up |
2016-03-09 | House | In returning messages |
2016-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 25 NAYS 15 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (829246) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1722 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2016-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-03 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 74 NAYS 44 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (155937) |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16 |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-09 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/09/16, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-04 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-03 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-28 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 6 |
2016-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1722 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1411 (Ch. 2016-150)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
873 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |