FL H1403 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1580 (Ch. 2023-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1580 (Ch. 2023-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes health care providers & health care payors to opt out of participation in or payment for health care services by conscience-based objections without discrimination or threat of adverse actions; requires health care provider to notify patient and health care provider's supervisor or employee or educational institution in writing when such health care provider declines to participate in health care services; prohibits boards and DOH from taking certain disciplinary actions.
Title
Protections of Medical Conscience
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1580 (Ch. 2023-57) |
2023-04-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-04-12 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2023-04-05 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-04-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-04 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-09 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1013 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 238 (Ch. 2023-42), CS/SB 252 (Ch. 2023-43)
S1580 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-57
S1580 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-57
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 00321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |