FL H1401 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOE to implement pilot program as public-private partnership in low-performing public schools; specifies services to be offered with goal of improving student academic achievement; provides requirements for implementation of program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reigniting Education Achievement with Coordinated Help Pilot Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Choice and Innovation Subcommittee
2013-03-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 4:30 pm, 306 HOB --Temporarily deferred
2013-03-08HouseReferred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1326 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback