FL H1401 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-133
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-133
Summary
Prohibits state agencies from issuing certain forms of documentation for any good, commodity, or thing of value to be exported to certain foreign countries.
Title
Export of Goods of Value to Foreign Countries [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Chapter No. 2010-133 | |
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01694 | |
2010-04-30 | Received -SJ 01586; Referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 01586; Withdrawn from Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 01246; Substituted for SB 2576 -SJ 01246; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Read 3rd time -SJ 01246; Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 01246 | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01064; Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 -HJ 01066 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00952 | |
2010-04-17 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00762 | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762 | |
2010-04-15 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00611; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00611 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 116-K | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00406; Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00406 | |
2010-03-22 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/24/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00125 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2576 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Withdrawn from General Government Appropriations -SJ 01241; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading; Placed on Special Order Calendar -SJ 01241; Read 2nd time -SJ 01246; Substituted HB 1401 -SJ 01246; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1401 (Ch. 2010-133) -SJ 01246
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1401&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |