FL H1397 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that city utility is public utility for certain purposes & subject to jurisdiction of Florida Public Service Commission; requires that city set fair, just, & reasonable rates; prescribes criteria for establishing revenue requirement; provides that PSC has authority to enforce provisions of act.
Title
City of Vero Beach, Indian River County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00256 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00125 | |
2010-02-26 | Filed |