FL H1395 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Pending: House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises various provisions relating to dissolution of marriage & alimony; creates presumption that equal time-sharing is in best interests of minor child; authorizes separate adjudication of issues in dissolution of marriage under certain circumstances; provides for temporary orders to protect parties & their children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dissolution of Marriage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1796 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
H1155 (Similar To) 2022-01-04 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6119Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback