FL H1391 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying & location information of certain current or former personnel of AHCA & names & personal identifying & location information of spouses & children of such personnel; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Agency for Health Care Administration Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1632 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S7030 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in returning Messages
S7030 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1391 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1391/BillText/Filed/PDF |