FL H1389 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions for removal or relocation of utility facilities that interfere with public roads or rail corridors; revises procedures; provides for payment of relocation expenses of certain facilities.
Title
Utility Right-of-way Relocation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 12:05 pm, 306 HOB --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 222 | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1389 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1389/BillText/Filed/HTML |