FL H1387 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes adult day care centers holding contracts with Medicaid managed care plans to provide nonemergency transportation services for their clients; provides reimbursement rates for such services; authorizes requests for waiver of continuing education requirements; provides continuing education requirements for adult date care center operators; provides required subject areas for such continuing education courses; provides compliance with continuing education requirements is condition precedent to issuance, continuation, reinstatement, & renewal of adult day care center licenses.
Title
Adult Day Care Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported out of Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Select Committee on Health Innovation (Amended) |
2024-02-02 | House | Favorable with amendment(s) by Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-31 | House | Added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S412 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 982 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 924 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |