FL H1387 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends weight limits for certain solid waste & recyclable collection vehicles under certain circumstances; requires invoices for solid waste collection to list certain taxes & fees; revises provisions relating to solid waste collection services to include disposal & recycling services; authorizes certain companies to bring actions against state agencies for specified violations; deletes exception for certain local government waste collection services; requires local governments providing certain solid waste services to remit certain fees & taxes & file reports; establishes crime of theft of recyclable property; provides penalties.
Title
Waste Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1192 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 70491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 70605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 0141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1387 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1387/BillText/Filed/PDF |