FL H1385 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of "child pornography" to include visual depictions in which it appears that minor is engaging in sexual conduct; provides that proof of identity of minor is not required; includes possession of child pornography within specified offenses.
Title
Child Pornography
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 603 | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 602 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 321 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 321 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 12:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 136 | |
2012-01-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0847 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
827 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1385 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1385/BillText/Filed/PDF |