FL H1375 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Board of Directors to govern the authority; providing for terms of office and appointment of members to the board; revising certain officer positions of the authority, etc.
Title
Holmes, Jackson, and Washington Counties
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#55 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#551 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#551 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (453683) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/06/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Local Administration Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |