FL H1367 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires managing entities to provide local workforce development boards with information about providers of behavioral health services; revises penalties for noncompliance with work requirements for receipt of temporary cash assistance; requires DEO to inform participants in temporary cash assistance program of work requirements & sanctions & penalties for noncompliance; prohibits use or acceptance of EBT card at specified locations; requires local workforce development boards to provide list of local providers of behavioral health services to temporary cash assistance recipients; directs AHCA to seek federal approval to require Medicaid enrollees to provide proof to DCF of engagement in work activities for receipt of temporary cash assistance as condition of eligibility & enrollment.
Title
Public Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Josie Tomkow [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 8 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/11/20, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1808 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 9082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1367 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1367/BillText/Filed/PDF |