FL H1363 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Pace Fire Rescue District; provides charter; requires referendum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Santa Rosa County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#317 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28 Chapter No. 2017-221
2017-06-06 Approved by Governor
2017-05-22 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-04HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-04SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-04SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/04/17
2017-04-28SenateReceived
2017-04-28SenateReferred to Rules
2017-04-27SenateIn Messages
2017-04-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 1
2017-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-13HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2017-04-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/13/17, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall --Not Considered
2017-03-29HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-29HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/29/17, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-24HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2017-03-22HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-21HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
2017-03-10HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback