FL H1361 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that regulation of tour-guide services in this state is solely responsibility of respective counties; deletes references to tour-guide services in provisions relating to certification of businesses, violations, & criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tour-guide Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-14 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 222
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 124
2011-03-07 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5599335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559937Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback