FL H1355 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises language concerning child abuse reporting; requires DCF to provide for web-chat & update other web-based forms for reporting; requires specified educational institutions & their law enforcement agencies to report known or suspected child abuse, abandonment, or neglect in certain circumstances; provides financial penalties for violations; increases penalties for certain reporting offenses; provides for upward reclassification of certain prostitution offenses involving minors; provides for denial of relocation payment for domestic violence claim if claimant has been paid sexual battery relocation claim for same incident; provides for relocation assistance payments to victims of sexual battery; provides criteria for awards; provides for denial of relocation payment for sexual battery claim if claimant has previously been paid domestic violence relocation claim for same incident; provides appropriations; authorizes specified numbers of full-time equivalent positions with associated salary rates within DCF; defines "mental injury" with respect to offenses of abuse, aggravated abuse, & neglect of child; requires physician or psychologist acting as expert witness in certain proceedings have certain credentials; redefines "crime" for purposes of crime victims compensation to include additional forms of injury; redefines "victim" to conform with modified definition of "crime." APPROPRIATION:
Title
Protection of Vulnerable Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1156 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1073 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1073 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1191 | |
2012-03-08 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 4 -SJ 962 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 961 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 946 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 857 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 1084 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1084 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1032 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time -HJ 905 | |
2012-02-28 | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 -HJ 908 | |
2012-02-27 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/28/12, 8:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-27 | Original reference(s) removed: Education Committee | |
2012-02-24 | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time -HJ 833 | |
2012-02-24 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-23 | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 835 | |
2012-02-21 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-02 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 452 | |
2012-01-30 | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 309 | |
2012-01-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 310 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/25/12, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee; Education Committee -HJ 215 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 134 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
796 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
827 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 198 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |