FL H1345 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises various provisions of Charlotte County Airport Authority Act; revises definitions; expands purpose of authority; revises provisions relating to members, officers, compensation, & meetings; revises powers of authority; revises requirements for expenditure of funds.
Title
Charlotte County Airport Authority/Charlotte Co.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#77 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1004 | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 648 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 577 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time -HJ 818 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 590 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-01 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 398 | |
2011-03-31 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 392 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/29/11, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 221 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 121 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |