FL H1343 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DACS to maintain an online application process for issuance of licenses & prohibiting it from arbitrarily or subjectively restricting access; provides for award of reasonable costs & attorney fees in successful actions against DACS to enforce specified provisions.
Title
Issuance of Licenses to Carry Concealed Weapons or Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1882 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism