FL H1343 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospital emergency departments to develop & implement policies and procedures, conduct training, record weights in certain manner, designate pediatric emergency care coordinator, & conduct specified assessments; requires each hospital emergency department to submit specified report to AHCA; requires AHCA to adopt rules for comprehensive emergency management plans, & in consultation with Florida Emergency Medical Services for Children State Partnership Program, establish minimum standards for pediatric patient care in hospital emergency departments.
Title
Health Care Patient Protection
Sponsors
House Health & Human Services Committee | House Select Committee on Health Innovation | Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Michael Grant [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Select Committee on Health Innovation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-02-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported out of Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-31 | House | PCS added to Select Committee on Health Innovation agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Select Committee on Health Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1418 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |