FL H1337 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-207
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DBPR's Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco to issue up to specified number of temporary permits to nonprofit civic organization to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises within special event permitted area designated by incorporated municipality; provides that such permits are in addition to certain other temporary permits; requires nonprofit civic organization to comply with certain provisions in obtaining permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pinellas County/Alcoholic Beverage Temporary Permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#348 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-207
2015-06-10 Approved by Governor
2015-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-29SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-14HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-04-10HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-04-09HouseFavorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2015-04-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-31HouseIntroduced
2015-03-31HouseReferred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-31HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback