FL H1337 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-37
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes disclosure of certain confidential information required of nursing license applicants to certain persons; provides & revises definitions; revises requirements for graduation from certain nursing education programs for nursing license applicants seeking to take licensing examination; revises restrictions on nursing graduates who may use certain titles & abbreviations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0008 - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0836 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-37
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -SJ 00808; CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 -SJ 00808
2010-04-23 Withdrawn from Health Regulation; Higher Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00776; Substituted for CS/SB 2530 -SJ 00777; Read 2nd time -SJ 00777
2010-04-21 In Messages; Received -SJ 00719; Referred to Health Regulation; Higher Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00719
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00798; CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00799
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00776; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00776
2010-04-07 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00629
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00629
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/07/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-31 Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00448
2010-03-30 CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -HJ 00422; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-26 CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00426
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-16 Favorable by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00312; Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00312
2010-03-14 Original reference(s) removed: Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; CS referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Education Policy Council -HJ 00279; Now in Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/16/10, 10:15 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-11 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-12 CS read 1st time on 03/12/10 -HJ 00272
2010-03-10 CS by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00273
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 03/10/10, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2010-03-03 Referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Education Policy Council -HJ 00206
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00121
2010-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2530 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00776; Amendment(s) adopted (652338) -SJ 00776; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1337 -SJ 00776; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1337 (Ch. 2010-37) -SJ 00776

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0456014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0458348Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0459025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0464003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0464008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0464015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0464019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0464022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
096028Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1337&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb133700.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb133701c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb133702c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb133703e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB13370421100836.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB13370426100008.html

Bill Comments

feedback