FL H1313 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Florida Public-Private Partnership Act; provides for private entities to develop & operate public-purpose projects; provides for procurement, consideration, & approval of projects; provides exemption from Consultant's Competitive Negotiation Act & any DMS interpretations, regulations, or guidelines; provides for affected local governments to comment on proposed projects; requires public entities to adopt & make publicly available specified guidelines for public-private agreements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-Private Partnerships

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-14 Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 221
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 119
2011-03-07 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback