FL H1293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires litigation financiers to register with DOS & file surety bond; provides requirements for litigation financing contracts; provides for assignment of contingent rights to civil action or claim proceeds; specifies priority of liens; authorizes litigation financiers to assess specified interest, fees, & charges; provides that violations are deceptive & unfair trade practices.
Title
Litigation Financing Consumer Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1750 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1293 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1293/BillText/Filed/PDF |