FL H1291 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-36
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deletes requirement that Governor's Task Force on Domestic Violence provide information & technical assistance to local domestic violence fatality review teams; provides that information & records acquired by team are not subject to discovery or introduction into evidence in criminal or administrative proceedings in certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Fatality Review Teams [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0012 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House Roll Call No. 0780 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-36
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-22 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00919
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -SJ 00664; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00664
2010-04-16 Received -SJ 00649; Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary -SJ 00649; Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary -SJ 00631; Substituted for SB 1446 -SJ 00631; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-15 Read 3rd time -HJ 00689; CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00689; Immediately certified -HJ 00714
2010-04-13 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00668
2010-04-06 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00610; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00610
2010-04-02 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-22 Favorable by Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00379; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00379
2010-03-18 CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -HJ 00338; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Health Care Services Policy (HFPC) -HJ 00340; On Committee agenda-- Health Care Services Policy (HFPC), 03/22/10, 3:30 pm, 306-H
2010-03-16 CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00343
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 03/16/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-03 Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00205
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00117
2010-02-24 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1446 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00631; Substituted CS/HB 1291 -SJ 00631; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1291 (Ch. 2010-36) -SJ 00631

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0741316Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback