FL H1283 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Small Business Investment Corporation; provides purpose; provides for board of directors appointed by Secretary of Economic Opportunity; provides that Secretary of Economic Opportunity shall serve as chief executive officer; provides powers of corporation; requires corporation to establish certain fund; authorizes & requires deposit of certain moneys into fund; requires certain moneys to be used for certain purpose.
Title
Small Business Investment Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1283 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1283/BillText/Filed/PDF |