FL H1281 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress to support creation of US Space Force & establishment of Space Force & US Space Command in Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Space Command and United States Space Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseAdopted
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-08HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback