FL H1269 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to propose to states an amendment to U.S. Constitution entitled "Regulation Freedom Amendment," which would require a federal regulation be adopted by majority vote of both houses of Congress if opposed by a specified percentage of membership of either house.
Title
Regulation Freedom Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2015-04-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-04-01 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1269 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1269/BillText/Filed/PDF |