FL H1251 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits specified activities concerning memorials; provides for liability & award of certain costs & damages for violations of the act; grants certain persons standing for enforcement of the act; provides criminal penalties for willful & malicious damage to or removal of certain memorials; revises the term "community service" for purposes of minors found to have committed certain acts.
Title
Preservation of Memorials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-20 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1690 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H31 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H31 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
265 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
806 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |