FL H1249 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Pending: House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that forensic client who is being held in jail awaiting admission to facility of DCF who is likely to regain competence to proceed may receive treatment at any facility designated by DCF.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Treatment of Defendants Adjudicated Incompetent to Stand Trial

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1600 (Same As) 2022-01-27 - On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91613Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback