FL H1249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain veterans & their surviving spouses receiving homestead tax exemption may apply for & receive prorated refund of property taxes paid on new homestead property acquired during certain timeframe; requires property appraiser to immediately make certain entries upon tax rolls to allow prorated refund.
Title
Transfer of Tax Exemption for Veterans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#562 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#562 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-140 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1662 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-19 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/19/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1662 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1249
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |