FL H1249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for identifying information of foster parent applicants & licensed foster parents, & spouses, minor children, & other adult household members thereof; provides for retroactive application; provides exception under certain circumstances; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Foster Parent Applicant and Foster Parent Names/Department of Children and Families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-26HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-25HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1622 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback