FL H1249 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes renewed membership in retirement system for certain retirees; requires that certain retirees who are employed on or after specified date be renewed members in investment plan; specifies that creditable service does not accrue for reemployed retiree during specified period; prohibits certain funds from being paid into renewed member's investment plan account for specified period of employment; requires employer & retiree to make applicable contributions to renewed member's investment plan account; prohibits purchase of past service in investment plan; authorizes renewed member to receive additional credit towards health insurance subsidy; provides for renewed membership in optional retirement program for certain retirees initially reemployed on or after specified date; making renewed member ineligible to receive disability benefits; revises definition of term "eligible employee"; provides for employer contribution rate increases to fund changes made by act; provides directive to Division of Law Revision & Information; declaring that act fulfills an important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Retirement System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Government Operations Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7042 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1214501Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback