FL H1245 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes AHCA to certify that Medicaid provider is out of business & that overpayments made to provider cannot be collected under state law; revises method for verifying vendor delivery of home health services under home health agency monitoring pilot project.
Title
Medicaid Provider Overpayments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#670 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#670 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter No. 2016-103 | |
2016-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1370 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-09 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/09/16, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-26 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | Favorable by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 12:30 pm, 306 HOB |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1370 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1245 (Ch. 2016-103)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 8132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |