FL H1239 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dissolves district; transfers assets, liabilities, & district responsibilities to the board of county commissioners; provides for disposition of certain taxes.
Title
South Lake County Hospital District, Lake County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#59 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#642 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#642 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-182 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 905 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 646 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time 619 |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18 |
2018-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-02-07 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Favorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/07/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-31 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-29 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | House | Filed |