FL H1239 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP's Division of Recreation & Parks to establish & supervise operation of Jack Nicklaus Golf Trail of Florida; requires construction of public golf facility in each park region; provides for locations & amenities of public golf facilities; requires division to contract with golf course development company for design, construction, & development of, & enter into long-term lease for operation of, public golf facilities; provides qualifications for golf course development company, etc.
Title
Jack Nicklaus Golf Trail of Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 220 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 111 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1239 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1239/BillText/Filed/HTML |